skip to content

Preisman, Mary

CPSO#: 88624

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room 933
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4563
Fax: (416) 586-8654 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Preisman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Preisman ( CPSO# 88624 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room 933
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY PREISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREISMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013