skip to content

Pratt, Lynn

CPSO#: 30878

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jul 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Pratt, Susan Lynn (used until: 08 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lynn Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Fort William Clinic 1260 Golf Links Road Thunder Bay, ON P7B 0A1
Date Received: 12 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2017