skip to content

Prapaitrakool, Sunisa

CPSO#: 90081

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chulalongkorn University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 07 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Mar 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010