Pranger, Emily Rachel (CPSO#: 97582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Johnson, Emily Rachel (used until: 18 Jun 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Rehabilitation Center
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3192 Logan Farm Drive
Osgoode ON  K0A 2W0
Canada
Phone: (613) 826-2502
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Pranger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pranger ( CPSO# 97582 )

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
The Ottawa Rehabilitation Center
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-7350

Business Address:
3192 Logan Farm Drive
Osgoode ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (613) 826-2502

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY RACHEL PRANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRANGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014