skip to content

Prakash, Ajay

CPSO#: 93892

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Sunset Drive
St Thomas ON  N5R 3C6
Phone: (519) 631-8510 Ext. 49402
Fax: (519) 637-5564 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AJAY PRAKASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAKASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Psychiatry

Western University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 28 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 28 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016