skip to content

Prabhu, Pooja Dhume

CPSO#: 94429

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Washington University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Suite 110
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 3030304
Fax: (905) 3033035 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Newman Breastfeeding Clinic
1255 Sheppard Avenue E
Toronto ON  M2K 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 498-0002
Fax: (416) 498-0012
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. D. Prabhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Prabhu ( CPSO# 94429 )

Business Address:
North Med Medical Building
Suite 206
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone Number: (905) 731-7596

Business Address:
Maple Kidz Clinic
110 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 303-0304


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Louisiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Sep 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active
 Dr. Pooja Dhume Prabhu may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics in an
            office based setting, only.