skip to content

Prabhakaran, Varagur Mohan

CPSO#: 32170

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Bangalore University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2019