skip to content

Pozdnyakov, Sergey Borisovich

CPSO#: 91962

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arkhangelsk State Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:03 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 04 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015