skip to content

Power, Heather Renee

CPSO#: 97148

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 17 May 2016 to 12 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2016