skip to content

Power, Daniel Jonathan

CPSO#: 85560

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Civic Campus Suite B310
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137985555 Ext. 14169
Fax: 6137615209 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daniel J. Power Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Power ( CPSO# 85560 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Suite B310
1053 Carling Avenue
Department of Anesthesia
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective:04 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL JONATHAN POWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2007 to 04 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2008 to 04 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2009 to 04 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006