Pourdjabbar, Ali (CPSO#: 90998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 749-7911
Fax: (519) 749-5644
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Pourdjabbar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pourdjabbar ( CPSO# 90998 )

Business Address:
201-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 749-7911

Business Address:
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI POURDJABBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POURDJABBAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013