skip to content

Poulin, Sacha

CPSO#: 87790

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Oct 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Montfort Hospital 713 Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1K 0T2
Date Received: 13 Jun 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:24 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008