skip to content

Potvin, Nicholas Anthony

CPSO#: 95000

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 670
Clinton ON  N0M1L0
Phone: 5194823000 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Potvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Potvin ( CPSO# 95000 )
Dr. N. Potvin ( CPSO# 97112 )

Business Address:
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
South Huron Hospital Exeter
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:08 Oct 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ANTHONY POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 09 May 2011 to 20 May 2011
EL - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2018