skip to content

Potvin, Nadine Susan

CPSO#: 97112

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M1L0
Phone: 519-482-3000
Fax: 519-482-7648 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Potvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Potvin ( CPSO# 95000 )
Dr. N. Potvin ( CPSO# 97112 )

Business Address:
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADINE SUSAN POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 02 Jan 2012 to 15 Jan 2012
EL - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2018