skip to content

Potoczny, Stefan

CPSO#: 96551

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Elm St
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stefan Potoczny Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Potoczny ( CPSO# 96551 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEFAN POTOCZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTOCZNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Apr 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011