skip to content

Pothier, David Douglas

CPSO#: 91887

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brenda Longo UHN 200 Elizabeth St Toronto, ON M5G 2C4 Phone: 416-310-4800
Date Received: 23 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 15 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2018