skip to content

Potechin, Rajini Bertha

CPSO#: 95717

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613)721-2000
Fax: (844)815-9975 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: (844)815-9975
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Potechin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Potechin ( CPSO# 95717 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 Jan 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJINI BERTHA POTECHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTECHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016