skip to content

Post, William Douglas

CPSO#: 28825

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:16 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009