Posso De Los Rios, Claudia Jimena (CPSO#: 96168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Caldas, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite M1
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gustavo Rubio Gomez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Posso De Los Rios ( CPSO# 96168 )
Dr. G. Rubio Gomez ( CPSO# 95554 )

Business Address:
8 - 33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone Number: (519) 836-8558

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
M1 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4908

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA JIMENA POSSO DE LOS RIOS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. POSSO DE LOS RIOS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. POSSO DE LOS RIOS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. POSSO DE LOS RIOS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. POSSO DE LOS RIOS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. POSSO DE LOS RIOS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. POSSO DE LOS RIOS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019