skip to content

Portugal, Francisco Suyat

CPSO#: 30962

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Mar 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Far Eastern University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 33 Howard St Toronto ON M4X 1J6
Instructions: Patients are asked to call 416-928-1197 to make arrangements for records pick up.
Date Received: 27 Mar 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Mar 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Aug 2010
Summary:

On August 10, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Portugal has committed an act of 
professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the 
Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Between June 2007 and June 2009, a patient, through her authorized representative, sent 
approximately thirteen requests to Dr. Portugal requesting copies of all of his clinical notes and 
records from 2002 to present.   Despite receiving these requests, Dr. Portugal failed to provide 
Patient A's clinical notes and records to the patient or her authorized representative. 
Dr. Portugal stated that the delay in response to the patient s request was as a result of failures by 
his office to either respond to the requests or bring them to his attention and he has instituted 
changes in order to avoid similar problems in the future. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Portugal's certificate of registration for a period of one month, 
      which suspension shall itself be suspended if, within two months of the date of this 
      Order: 
 
      i.    Dr. Portugal retains the services of a third party organization/efficiency expert (the 
            "TPO") to evaluate his current administrative practices; 
      ii.   Dr. Portugal implements all reasonable recommendations made by the TPO 
            regarding the management and day to day administration of his practice; and 
      iii.  Dr. Portugal provides a letter from the TPO confirming that all reasonable 
            recommendations have been implemented.  
 
2.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Portugal's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Portugal shall provide a report from the TPO twelve months after he 
            implements all of their recommendations, confirming that his organization system 
            remains working and that his practice is running efficiently; and 
 
      (b)   Dr. Portugal shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's 
            Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course within twelve months of the date of 
            this Order. 
 
3.    The terms, conditions and limitations in paragraph 2 herein shall be removed by the 
      College after it receives confirmation that those terms, conditions and limitations have 
      been fulfilled. 
 
4.    Dr. Portugal appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
5.    Dr. Portugal pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date 
      of this Order.  
 
6.    The results of this proceeding be included in the register. 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 10, 2010

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Francisco Suyat Portugal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 18, 2016:

An investigation into Dr. Portugal’s practice revealed deficiencies in his infection prevention and control practices. While Dr. Portugal has remedied these deficiencies, the College wishes to ensure that he continues to employ acceptable infection prevention and control practices. Therefore, the College will be conducting unannounced inspections into Dr. Portugal’s practices, approximately every six months for at least two years.