skip to content

Porter, William Ronald

CPSO#: 26852

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. W. Ronald Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 15 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr Dominic Li Suite 1116 123 Edwards St Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 04 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018