skip to content

Porter, Sara Lara

CPSO#: 86755

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Adult mental health services
Parkside 0
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Fax: 613-540-8794 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Providence Manor LTC
275 Sydenham Street
Kingston ON  K7K1G7
Canada
Phone: 613-549-4164
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

THe Royale Retirement Residence
2485 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M3G1
Canada
Phone: 613-328-2661
Fax: 613-634-5972
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

The Kingsbridge Retirement Residenc
950 Centennial Drive
Kingston ON  K7M0G8
Canada
Phone: 613-583-2555
Fax: 613-650-1445
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA LARA PORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012