skip to content

Porter, Richard Edgar Allan

CPSO#: 27389

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jun 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 20 2016
Corporation Name: R.E.A. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Porter ( CPSO# 27389 )

Business Address:
55 - 30 Regent Avenue
Hamilton ON  L9B 1B3
Phone Number: (905) 296-4273

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 31, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dr. Richard Edgar Allan Porter to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Porter engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent. In the face of this investigation, effective August 31, 2020 Dr. Porter agreed to resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)