skip to content

Porter, Justin Michael James

CPSO#: 91090

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Frederick St
Orillia ON  L3V 5W6
Phone: 7053276568
Fax: 7053261534 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Porter ( CPSO# 91090 )

Business Address:
Couchiching Family Health Team
Unit 104C
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 327-6568

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTIN MICHAEL JAMES PORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012