skip to content

Porter, Jean Evelyn

CPSO#: 21687

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jean E. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2017

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Records Management, 1High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto, Ont. M9L 0A3 T: 1800 775 0093 F: 647 933 2904
Date Received: 31 Dec 2021


Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 416-258-5734 or 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 1-888-316-4125 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 30 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2021