skip to content

Porte, Alexis N'gai

CPSO#: 92848

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Porte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Westview Medical, Suite 101, 550 Carmi Avenue, Penticton, BC V2A 3G6
Date Received: 16 May 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
Newfoundland and Labrador
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 08 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
EL - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2011 to 11 Apr 2011
EL - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016