skip to content

Popuri, Ramu

CPSO#: 85598

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:University of Liverpool, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ramu Popuri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Popuri ( CPSO# 85598 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:27 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMU POPURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPURI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2008