skip to content

Popuri, Preeti

CPSO#: 86883

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Telugu

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 MAIN STREET WEST
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: 905 546 9885
Fax: (905) 972 8903 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

347 Colborne Street East
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Canada
Phone: 519-758-0008
Fax: 226-401-3818
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

7 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 2L8
Canada
Phone: 905-684-2777
Fax: 905-684-2776
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PREETI POPURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008