skip to content

Popkin, Charles Aaron

CPSO#: 96663

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tulane University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012