skip to content

Pope, Jennifer Rachel

CPSO#: 95068

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
D2-1036 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone: 6135469721
Fax: 6135462799 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gallupe Pope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pope ( CPSO# 95068 )
Dr. P. Gallupe ( CPSO# 95526 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Business Address:
125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston ON  L7M 3T6
Phone Number: (613) 384-4664

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER RACHEL POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014