skip to content

Poonah, Muhammad Fairoze

CPSO#: 93158

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Downtown Professional Centre
Suite 202
83 Mill St
Georgetown ON  L7G 5E9
Phone: (905) 873-2402
Fax: (905) 873-2411 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Intrepid Health Centre
Riverview Heights
75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON  L6Y6H4
Canada
Phone: 2894014678
Fax: 2894014676
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Intrepid Medical Centre
Unit 106
250 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON  L5B1J2
Canada
Phone: 9052752273
Fax: 9052752297
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Intrepid Medical Centre & Walk-In
379 Bond St W
Oshawa ON  L1J 8R7
Canada
Phone: (905) 240-4678
Fax: (905) 240-7334
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.F. Poonah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poonah ( CPSO# 93158 )

Business Address:
379 Bond Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 8R7
Phone Number: (905) 240-4678

Business Address:
75 Montpelier Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 6H4
Phone Number: (289) 401-4678

Business Address:
106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1J2
Phone Number: (905) 275-2273

Business Address:
Suite 202
83 Mill Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 5E9
Phone Number: (905) 873-2402

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Dec 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Dec 2019 Active
             As from December 6, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Muhammad Fairoze
            Poonah in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Poonah to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. MUHAMMAD FAIROZE POONAH
                                          ("Dr. Poonah")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Poonah, certificate of registration number 93158, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College
                  conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1105717 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or
                  am incompetent in my family practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.
            (5)   I, Dr. Poonah, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs during the period of Clinical
                  Supervision and until my Reassessment, which will include at least the
                  following information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                  (i)   the date of the appointment;
                  (ii)  the name of the patient;
                  (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  (iv)  the clinical indication;
                  (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different
                        dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N); 
                  (vi)  my signature.
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        at least five (5) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for at
                              least the first two (2) months ("Moderate Level
                              Supervision"). Upon receiving permission to transition to low
                              level supervision, the frequency of visits will be no less
                              than monthly for a further three (3) months ("Low Level
                              Supervision");
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month during Moderate Level Supervision and one final report
                              at the end of the three (3) months of Low Level Supervision,
                              or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns
                              about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor
                        dated August 26, 2019, and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and Monitored Drugs until such time as I have obtained a
                        Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                        Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and Monitored
                        Drugs as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   In the course of this investigation, I, Dr. Poonah, voluntarily
                        enrolled in the following courses: 
                  
                        (i)   Safer Opioid Prescribing Series, University of Toronto;
                        (ii)  Buprenorphine-Naloxone Treatment for Opioid Use Disorder
                              Online Course, CAMH; and 
                        (iii) Medical Record Keeping, University of Toronto.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Course: Safer Opioid Prescribing Series, University of
                              Toronto;
                        (ii)  Course: Opioids Clinical Primer, machealth Programs; 
                        (iii) Course: Buprenorphine-Naloxone Treatment for Opioid Use
                              Disorder Online Course, CAMH; 
                        (iv)  Course: Medical Record Keeping, University of Toronto; 
                        (v)   Review and written summary of: 
                              1.    Prescribing Drugs, CPSO; 
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain, Michael G. DeGroote National Pain
                                    Centre;
                              3.    Medical Records, CPSO;  
                        (vi)  Review and adoption into practice of: 
                              1.    Management of Chronic Non-Cancer Pain Tool, Centre for
                                    Effective Practice; 
                              2.    Opioid Use Disorder (OUD) Tool, Centre for Effective
                                    Practice; and
                        (vii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake to complete the course requirements by the
                        first possible opportunity and the self-study components within
                        four (4) months of signing this Undertaking.
                  (e)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of
                        the Professional Education set out in section (7) above, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or
                        "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, an interview with
                        me, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Poonah, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Poonah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following a public complaint, a College investigation was
                              conducted into whether Dr. Poonah engaged in professional
                              misconduct and/or is incompetent in his practice of family
                              medicine. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Poonah will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 5
                                    months. 
                  
                                    Dr. Poonah will engage in professional education in
                                    opioid prescribing and medical record keeping.
                  
                                    Dr. Poonah's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months of the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision and Professional
                                    Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Poonah, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Poonah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Poonah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Poonah, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Muhammad Fairoze Poonah to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 6, 2019:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Poonah engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Poonah will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 5 months.

- Dr. Poonah will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing and medical record keeping.

- Dr. Poonah’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and Professional Education.