skip to content

Poon, Annette Olive

CPSO#: 24928

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009