skip to content

Pook, Benjamin Patrick

CPSO#: 87107

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 George St N
Cambridge ON  N1S 2M8
Phone: (519) 622-4529
Fax: (519) 622-3563 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Pook Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pook ( CPSO# 87107 )

Business Address:
Grand River Sports Medical Centre
40 George Street North
Cambridge ON  N1S 2M8
Phone Number: (519) 622-4529

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN PATRICK POOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012