skip to content

Ponzo, Marisa Grace

CPSO#: 97617

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2012 to 22 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2017 to 29 Jan 2017
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2012