Pontoriero, Giuseppe Francesco (CPSO#: 100742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 208
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone: (905) 632-2542
Fax: (905) 632-2617
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Pontoriero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Pontoriero ( CPSO# 100742)

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7

Business Address:
208 - 2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone Number: (905) 632-2542

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE FRANCESCO PONTORIERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONTORIERO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015