skip to content

Pommerville, Peter John Joseph Osias

CPSO#: 31360

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 1978 to 15 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2009