skip to content

Pomer, Edward Stanley

CPSO#: 25724

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 21 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South North York ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Dec 2016