skip to content

Pollett, Judith Anne Whittaker

CPSO#: 26710

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Free University of Berlin, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical records may send a written request to: Pain Care Clinics Unit 2 - 6981 Millcreek Drive Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Date Received: 14 Dec 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 28 Sep 1981 to 16 Oct 1981
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 03 May 1982 to 04 Jul 1982
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1982 to 01 Oct 1982
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Feb 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019