Pollard, Joseph Alexander (CPSO#: 100018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oklahoma State Uni College of Osteopathi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CHEO
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Hawaii

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2018 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ALEXANDER POLLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2019