skip to content

Pollard, Fraser Thompson

CPSO#: 100250

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte West Medical Centre
80 Catherine Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone: 613-394-0770 Ext. 6
Fax: 613-480-6586 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pollard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Pollard ( CPSO# 100250)

Business Address:
Quinte West Medical Centre
80 Catherine Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone Number: (613) 394-0770

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRASER THOMPSON POLLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015