skip to content

Poliquin, Vanessa

CPSO#: 94782

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2011 to 09 Mar 2011
EL - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2014 to 11 Dec 2014
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 2014