skip to content

Polevoy, Terry Alan

CPSO#: 23685

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jun 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place North York, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 Waterloo Walk-In Clinic 170 University Ave. W. Waterloo, ON N2L 3E9 Tel: 519-725-1514 Fax: 519-725-5137
Date Received: 12 Nov 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020