skip to content

Pokrupa, Ronald Peter

CPSO#: 28994

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
22 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ronald P. Pokrupa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 22 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 2021