skip to content

Poirier, Steven Frederick Joseph

CPSO#: 93278

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 Bell Farm Road
suite 001
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: 705-728-5261
Fax: 705-728-5265 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Steven Poirier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Poirier ( CPSO# 93278 )

Business Address:
Suite 001
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 728-5261

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVEN FREDERICK JOSEPH POIRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POIRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012