skip to content

Po, Leslie Kin Wai

CPSO#: 91152

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
B725
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-5982
Fax: 416-480-6841 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Leslie K. Po Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Po ( CPSO# 91152 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
B725 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5982

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LESLIE KIN WAI PO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014