skip to content

Plume, Julie Thelma Jean

CPSO#: 97571

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Plume Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Plume ( CPSO# 97571 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIE THELMA JEAN PLUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLUME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014