skip to content

Platt, Jennica Lynne

CPSO#: 90996

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
1017 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (647) 946-5439
Fax: (888) 610-5439 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 303
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 2T3
Brampton ON  L6R 2T3
Canada
Phone: (647) 946-5439
Fax: (888) 610-5439
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.L. Platt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kundhal ( CPSO# 81026 )
Dr. J. Platt ( CPSO# 90996 )

Business Address:
Unit 303
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (647) 946-5439

Business Address:
104-1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (647) 946-5439

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (647) 946-5439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNICA LYNNE PLATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016