Plante, Louis-Philippe (CPSO#: 99003)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Louis-Philippe Plante Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Emergency Department Medical Records 980 Oliver Road Thunder Bay, ON P7B 6V4
Date Received: 20 Apr 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017