skip to content

Plant, Mathew Aaron

CPSO#: 88388

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1131A Leslie St
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Phone: (416) 907-4704
Fax: (888) 591-9033 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
418 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A2
Canada
Phone: 6474782580
Fax: 6476893346
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Plant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Plant ( CPSO# 88388 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
418 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A2
Phone Number: (416) 907-4704

Business Address:
4763 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 224-8800

Business Address:
Clinic 360
Unit 300
1131A Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 907-4704

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:23 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATHEW AARON PLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2014