skip to content

Pizzuti, Giancarlo Fiorino

CPSO#: 95319

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 128
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0252
Fax: (519) 946-0253 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Giancarlo Pizzuti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Pizzuti ( CPSO# 95319 )

Business Address:
Suite 128
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-0252

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GIANCARLO FIORINO PIZZUTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIZZUTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013